IL HB2502 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Enrolled on May 30 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Passed Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Downstate Firefighter and Chicago Firefighter Articles of the Illinois Pension Code. Provides that until 6 months after the effective date of the amendatory Act, creditable service may be transferred from municipal firefighters' pension funds to the Firemen's Annuity and Benefit Fund of Chicago. Removes a provision restricting the amount of creditable service that may be transferred. Authorizes, until 6 months after the effective date of the amendatory Act, the transfer of creditable service from the Firemen's Annuity and Benefit Fund of Chicago to municipal firefighters' pension funds. Amends the State Mandates Act to provide for implementation without reimbursement. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PEN CD-ARTS 4 & 6-TRANSFER

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 91 N: 18 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-30HousePassed Both Houses
2019-05-30SenateThird Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
2019-05-24SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2019
2019-05-24SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2019-05-24SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2019-05-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 24, 2019
2019-05-23SenateSecond Reading
2019-05-22SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 23, 2019
2019-05-22SenateDo Pass Government Accountability and Pensions; 010-000-000
2019-05-21SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler
2019-05-21SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2019-05-20SenateWaive Posting Notice
2019-05-17SenateAssigned to Government Accountability and Pensions
2019-05-17SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 24, 2019
2019-05-10SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 17, 2019
2019-05-07SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson
2019-05-07SenateAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Cristina Castro
2019-04-03SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-04-03SenateFirst Reading
2019-04-03SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson
2019-04-03SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2019-04-03SenateArrive in Senate
2019-03-28HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 091-018-000
2019-03-26HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
2019-03-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa
2019-03-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2019-03-20HouseRemove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2019-03-20HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2019-03-19HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-19HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-14HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-14HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Personnel & Pensions Committee; 006-004-000
2019-03-14HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Personnel & Pensions Committee; by Voice Vote
2019-03-05HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Personnel & Pensions Committee
2019-02-27HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-02-27HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kathleen Willis
2019-02-26HouseAssigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee
2019-02-13HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-13HouseFirst Reading
2019-02-13HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Kathleen Willis

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
308058.43New CodeSee Bill Text
4054-108.6Amended CodeCitation Text
4054-108.7New CodeSee Bill Text
4056-227Amended CodeCitation Text
4056-227.1New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback