IL HB2502 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 29 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-29 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0176
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 29 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-29 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0176
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Chicago Teacher Article of the Illinois Pension Code. Provides that any earned sick pay which is payable by an employer shall be considered pensionable earnings as provided by Section 17-134 and the charter school shall certify the number of sick days being paid. Also provides that any sum paid by a charter school employer before or after the school year shall be considered pensionable earnings if the payment is conditioned in any way on service being performed by the contributor. Amends the State Mandates Act to require implementation without reimbursement. Effective immediately.
Title
PENCD-CHGO TCHR-CHARTER-SERVIC
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-29 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0176 |
2015-07-29 | House | Effective Date July 29, 2015 |
2015-07-29 | House | Governor Approved |
2015-06-19 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2015-05-21 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 21, 2015; |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 12, 2015 |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Do Pass Licensed Activities and Pensions; 008-000-000 |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Assigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-04-21 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2015-04-20 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000 |
2015-04-17 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-04-17 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-03-26 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-03-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2015-03-26 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Personnel and Pensions Committee; 009-000-000 |
2015-03-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Personnel and Pensions Committee; by Voice Vote |
2015-03-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Personnel and Pensions Committee |
2015-03-18 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-03-18 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
2015-03-11 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Personnel and Pensions Committee |
2015-03-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kenneth Dunkin |
2015-03-10 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-03-10 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
2015-03-02 | House | Assigned to Personnel and Pensions Committee |
2015-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-18 | House | First Reading |
2015-02-18 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 805 | 8.39 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 17-133.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |