IL HB2499 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Enrolled on June 16 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-07-15 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Boat Registration and Safety Act. Changes the definitions Section to put the terms in alphabetical order and changes the definitions of "airboat", "motorboat", "nonpowered watercraft", "operate", "owner", "person", "personal watercraft", and "sailboat". Defines "inland rules", "international regulations", "leeward", "operator", "principally operate", "throwable PDF", "wearable U.S. Coast Guard approved personal flotation device", and "windward side". Makes additional changes and adds provisions in Sections concerning: corrected certificates; towed watercraft; personal flotation devices; navigation lights; interference with navigation; and traffic rules.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ELECTRONIC SIGNATURE WAIVER

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-16 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - Motion in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-15HouseSent to the Governor
2021-06-16HousePassed Both Houses
2021-06-16HouseHouse Concurs
2021-06-16HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 111-000-000
2021-06-16HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Revenue & Finance Committee; 013-000-000
2021-06-15HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Revenue & Finance Committee
2021-06-15HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2021-06-15HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Lance Yednock
2021-06-15HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Lance Yednock
2021-06-15HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
2021-06-15HouseArrived in House
2021-06-15SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2021-06-15SenateThird Reading - Passed; 056-001-000
2021-06-15SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Withdrawn by Sen. Don Harmon
2021-06-15SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2021-06-15SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe
2021-06-15SenateAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Ram Villivalam
2021-06-01SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2021-06-01SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
2021-06-01SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
2021-05-31SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As June 15, 2021
2021-05-31SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2021-05-31SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
2021-05-31SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2021-05-30SenateAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
2021-05-20SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 21, 2021
2021-05-20SenateSecond Reading
2021-05-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 20, 2021
2021-05-19SenateDo Pass as Amended Executive; 016-000-000
2021-05-19SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2021-05-17SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
2021-05-14SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2021-05-14SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam
2021-05-11SenateAssigned to Executive
2021-04-29SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John Connor
2021-04-23SenateReferred to Assignments
2021-04-23SenateFirst Reading
2021-04-23SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam
2021-04-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2021-04-23SenateArrive in Senate
2021-04-22HouseThird Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 113-000-000
2021-04-21HouseThird Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day
2021-04-16HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar
2021-04-15HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar
2021-04-15HouseSecond Reading - Consent Calendar
2021-04-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar
2021-03-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Elik
2021-03-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne Ness
2021-03-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2021-03-22HouseDo Pass / Consent Calendar Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 013-000-000
2021-03-18HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee
2021-03-17HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2021-03-17HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2021-03-09HouseAssigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee
2021-02-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael T. Marron
2021-02-19HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2021-02-19HouseFirst Reading
2021-02-17HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Martin J. Moylan

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
517525-120New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2499&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB2499.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB2499eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB2499enr.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB2499ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB2499sam001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB2499sam002.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB2499sam003.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/102/house/10200HB2499_04222021_108008.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/102/house/10200HB2499_04222021_108008T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/102/senate/10200HB2499_06152021_012000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/102/house/10200HB2499sam001_06162021_012000C.pdf

Bill Comments 750

feedback