IL HB2497 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-3)
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2019
Hearing: May 28 @ 9:00 am in Room 400
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Criminal and Traffic Assessment Act. Provides that in each county in which Court Appointed Special Advocates provide services, a Court Appointed Special Advocates Fund is specifically for the operations of the Court Appointed Special Advocates, from which the county board shall make grants to support the activities and services of the Court Appointed Special Advocates within that county. Effective July 1, 2019.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CRIM&TRAFFIC ASSESS ACT-FUNDS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-09 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-24SenateRule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2019
2019-05-23SenateWaive Posting Notice
2019-05-23SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy
2019-05-20SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2019-05-17SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 24, 2019
2019-05-16SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2019-05-15SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2019-05-15SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
2019-05-14SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe
2019-05-14SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2019-05-14SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2019-05-14SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Christopher Belt
2019-05-13SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2019-05-10SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2019-05-10SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie
2019-05-10SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 17, 2019
2019-05-07SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
2019-05-02SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-05-02SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Christopher Belt
2019-04-26SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine
2019-04-24SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2019-04-17SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
2019-04-15SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin
2019-04-10SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-04-10SenateFirst Reading
2019-04-10SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt
2019-04-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2019-04-10SenateArrive in Senate
2019-04-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2019-04-09HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000
2019-04-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2019-04-02HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-02HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-02HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
2019-03-29HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2019-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-28HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Counties & Townships Committee; 017-000-000
2019-03-21HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2019-02-26HouseAssigned to Counties & Townships Committee
2019-02-13HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-13HouseFirst Reading
2019-02-13HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. LaToya Greenwood

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
70513510-5Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback