IL HB2494 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Juvenile Justice Law of the Unified Code of Corrections. Provides that subject to appropriation, if a county detention center holds in their custody a juvenile under a warrant issued by the Department of Juvenile Justice, the Department shall reimburse the local county detention facility the normal daily rate for the local detention center for each day the juvenile is held. Effective immediately.
Title
JUV CORR-COUNTY REIMBURSEMENT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-04-28 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-26 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-30 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-30 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 013-000-000 |
2017-03-30 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary - Criminal Committee; by Voice Vote |
2017-03-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2017-03-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2017-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-07 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
730 | 5 | 3-2.5-70 | Amended Code | Citation Text |