IL HB2492 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on August 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0366
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that the Code Chapter governing size, weight, and load of vehicles does not apply to fire apparatus or authorized emergency vehicles owned or operated by any governmental body or not-for-profit fire protection service organization or agency. Removes a provision providing that an emergency vehicle may not exceed 86,000 pounds gross weight or other listed weights.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

VEH CD-FIRE&EMRGNCY VEH-WEIGHT

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-25HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0366
2017-08-25HouseEffective Date January 1, 2018
2017-08-25HouseGovernor Approved
2017-06-28HouseSent to the Governor
2017-05-30HousePassed Both Houses
2017-05-30SenateThird Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
2017-05-26SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-05-12SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2017-05-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2017
2017-05-12SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2017
2017-05-09SenateDo Pass Transportation; 015-000-000
2017-05-02SenateAssigned to Transportation
2017-04-25SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-04-25SenateFirst Reading
2017-04-25SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2017-03-29SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading March 30, 2017
2017-03-29SenateArrive in Senate
2017-03-29HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2017-03-29HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps
2017-03-29HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente
2017-03-29HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2017-03-29HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000
2017-03-23HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-23HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-22HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-22HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 009-000-000
2017-03-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; by Voice Vote
2017-03-15HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
2017-03-14HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-14HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
2017-02-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-08HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-07HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
625515-101Amended CodeCitation Text
625515-111Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback