IL HB2491 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-14 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-14 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that veterans who served in active duty status during the Vietnam War but were not deployed to Vietnam for combat are eligible for Vietnam veteran license plates.
Title
VEH CD-VIETNAM SPECIAL PLATES
Sponsors
Rep. Charles Meier [R] | Rep. Tony McCombie [R] | Rep. Mark Batinick [R] | Rep. Ryan Spain [R] |
Rep. Thomas Morrison [R] | Rep. Chris Miller [R] | Rep. Mark Luft [R] | Rep. Daniel Swanson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2022-02-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Luft |
2021-04-23 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-21 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-21 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller |
2021-04-20 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-20 | House | Removed from Consent Calendar Status Rep. Avery Bourne |
2021-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2021-04-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-15 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-15 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2021-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2021-03-18 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-03-17 | House | Do Pass / Consent Calendar Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 010-000-000 |
2021-03-09 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2021-02-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2021-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-17 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Charles Meier |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 3-645 | Amended Code | Citation Text |