IL HB2485 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on August 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-11 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0060
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on August 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-11 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0060
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Finance Act. Creates the Prostate Cancer Awareness Fund as a special fund in the State treasury. Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code to allow for the issuance of decals by the Illinois Department of Public Health. Provides for the original and renewal fees and fee distribution for Universal special license plates with decals issued by the Illinois Department of Public Health.
Title
VEH CD-PROSTATE CANCER DECAL
Sponsors
Rep. Norine Hammond [R] | Rep. Timothy Butler [R] | Rep. Patricia Bellock [R] | Sen. Jil Tracy [R] |
Sen. Kwame Raoul [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-19 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-11 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0060 |
2017-08-11 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2018 |
2017-08-11 | House | Governor Approved |
2017-06-16 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2017-05-19 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-000 |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2017 |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 4, 2017 |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Do Pass Transportation; 014-000-000 |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-03-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-03-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2017-03-15 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-000-001 |
2017-03-13 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2017-03-09 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-09 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-08 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 009-000-000 |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-07 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 105 | 5.878 | New Code | See Bill Text |
625 | 5 | 3-699.14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |