IL HB2482 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Repeals a Section authorizing the issuance of Knights of Columbus Special License Plates. Provides instead that the Department of Human Services may issue decals for Universal special license plates. Provides that the cost for the decals shall be $25 at original issuance and renewal. Provides that $15 of each original issuance and $2 of each renewal shall be deposited into the Secretary of State Special License Plate Fund. Provides that $10 of each original issuance and $2 of each renewal shall be deposited into the Knights of Columbus Fund. Provides that money in the Knights of Columbus Fund shall be paid as grants to charitable entities designated by the Knights of Columbus. Makes a corresponding change in the State Finance Act. Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that the owner of a motor vehicle of the first division or a motor vehicle of the second division weighing 8,000 pounds or less propelled by an electric engine and not utilizing motor fuel who qualifies for any veteran license plate offered by the Secretary of State shall pay the same registration fee as that charged for his or her qualifying plate. Effective immediately.
Title
VEH-CD–LICENSE PLATE FEES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-09 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-17 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 105 | 5.935 | New Code | See Bill Text |
625 | 5 | 3-636 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 3-699.14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 3-805 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2482&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB2482.htm |