IL HB2482 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-22 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-22 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code to allow for the issuance of In God We Trust special license plate decals by the Illinois Department of Veterans' Affairs. Provides that $11 of each original issuance and $24 of each renewal shall be deposited into the Illinois Veterans' Homes Fund, and that $15 of each original issuance and $2 of each renewal shall be deposited into the Secretary of State Special License Plate Fund.
Title
VEH CD-IN GOD WE TRUST PLATES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer |
2019-05-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney |
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2019-03-06 | House | To Special Issues Subcommittee (TVS) |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2019-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Darren Bailey |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Dave Severin |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 3-699.14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2482&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB2482.htm |