IL HB2482 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-04-03 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-04-03 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Comprehensive Health Insurance Plan Act. Adds a provision requiring that the Plan provide coverage for mammograms and prosthetic devices or reconstructive surgery incident to a mastectomy, Pap tests, prostate-specific antigen tests, colorectal cancer examination and screening, and contraceptives as required under certain Sections of the Illinois Insurance Code. Provides that any expense or charge for routine physical examinations or tests related to certain covered benefits are not excluded from coverage under the Plan. Deletes a provision excluding any expense or charge for oral contraceptives used for birth control or any other temporary birth control measures from coverage under the Plan.
Title
CHIP-REQUIRED PLAN COVERAGE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-03 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-04-02 | Fiscal Note Filed | |
2009-04-01 | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-04-01 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-25 | Fiscal Note Filed | |
2009-03-24 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Karen May | |
2009-03-11 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-11 | Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 004-001-000 | |
2009-02-25 | Assigned to Human Services Committee | |
2009-02-20 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-20 | First Reading | |
2009-02-20 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang | |
2009-02-19 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2482&GAID=10&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/HB/09600HB2482.htm |