IL HB2481 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Wildlife Code. Removes the prohibition on the use of a silencer or other device to muffle or mute the sound of the explosion or report resulting from the firing of any gun. Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Provides that a person commits the offense of unlawful use of weapons when he knowingly uses, attaches, or possesses with the intent to use or attach any device or attachment of any kind for silencing the report of any handgun, unless the use, attachment, or possession with the intent to use the device or attachment is on the premises of a firing or shooting range; or possess any device or attachment of any kind designed, used, or intended for use in silencing the report of any other firearm if the device or attachment is not possessed in compliance with the National Firearms Act. Provides that a person commits the offense of unlawful sale or delivery of firearms when he or she knowingly transfers or gives a suppressor or silencer to a person not authorized to possess the suppressor or silencer under federal law. Provides that a violation of this provision is a Class 3 felony. Effective immediately.
Title
POSSESSION & USE OF SILENCERS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-04-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2017-03-15 | House | To Firearms and Firearm Safety Subcommittee |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-07 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
520 | 5 | 2.33 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 24-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 24-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2481&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB2481.htm |