IL HB2477 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-28 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0149
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-28 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0149
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Credit Union Act. Provides that the failure of an out-of-state credit union to register with the Secretary of Financial and Professional Regulation shall not impair the collectability of a loan made to a resident of this State. Provides that, for a renewal, refinancing, or restructuring of an existing loan at the credit union that is secured by an interest or equity in real estate, a new appraisal of the collateral shall not be required when (i) no new moneys are advanced other than funds necessary to cover reasonable closing costs, or (ii) there has been no obvious or material change in market conditions or physical aspects of the real estate that threatens the adequacy of the credit union's real estate collateral protection after the transaction, even with the advancement of new moneys. Provides that a credit union may act as a representative of and enter into an agreement with credit unions or other organizations for the purposes of providing implementation and administrative support services related to the use of debit cards, payroll debit cards, and other prepaid debit cards and credit cards. Effective immediately.
Title
CREDIT UNION ACT
Sponsors
Rep. Louis Lang [D] | Rep. Adam Brown [R] | Rep. Andre Thapedi [D] | Sen. David Koehler [D] |
Sen. Terry Link [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-28 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0149 |
2015-07-28 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2016 |
2015-07-28 | House | Governor Approved |
2015-06-29 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2015-05-31 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2015-05-31 | House | House Concurs |
2015-05-31 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 108-000-002 |
2015-05-27 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Revenue & Finance Committee; 009-000-000 |
2015-05-25 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2015-05-22 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-05-22 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Lou Lang |
2015-05-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2015-05-21 | House | Arrived in House |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Koehler |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Financial Institutions; 007-000-000 |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Financial Institutions |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 20, 2015 |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Second Reading |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 30, 2015 |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Do Pass Financial Institutions; 007-000-000 |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Assigned to Financial Institutions |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-04-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 15, 2015 |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2015-04-14 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-001 |
2015-03-25 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-03-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2015-03-25 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-03-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000 |
2015-03-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-03-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lou Lang |
2015-03-18 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-03-17 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Financial Institutions Committee; 019-000-000 |
2015-03-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi |
2015-03-02 | House | Assigned to Financial Institutions Committee |
2015-02-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Adam Brown |
2015-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-18 | House | First Reading |
2015-02-18 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lou Lang |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
205 | 305 | 46 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
205 | 305 | 57.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
205 | 305 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |