IL HB2476 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-31 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the State Officials and Employees Ethics Act. Provides that the Inspector General may require an ethics officer to provide relevant information as may be necessary to make an informed determination concerning whether to allow a former State employee to accept employment from a new employer in which he or she may have personally and substantially participated in decisions that benefited the new employer. Specifies requirements for written restricted determinations. Requires ethics officers to, among other requirements, successfully complete a training curriculum to be developed by the Executive Ethics Commission and thereafter successfully complete an annual training program. Provides that after an Executive Inspector General issues a summary report of an investigation, the ultimate jurisdictional authority or agency head may disclose Office of Executive Inspector General investigatory files and reports to agency staff who are necessary and responsible for determining and imposing discipline, and to an employee accused of wrongdoing for the purpose of determining and imposing appropriate discipline. Provides that the head and employees of a State agency affected by or involved in an investigation shall keep confidential and shall not disclose information exempted from disclosure under the Freedom of Information Act or by the State Officials and Employees Ethics Act. Provides additional exceptions under which investigatory files, reports, and requests for documents may be disclosed. Amends the Illinois Procurement Code to modify a Section concerning revolving door prohibitions. Makes conforming changes. Contains a severability clause. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ETHICS-PROCURE & REVOLVE DOOR

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-02-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-08HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-07HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3050050-30Amended CodeCitation Text
543020-23Amended CodeCitation Text
543020-50Amended CodeCitation Text
543020-90Amended CodeCitation Text
543020-95Amended CodeCitation Text
54305-45Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback