IL HB2467 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Medical Assistance Article of the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that beginning July 1, 2017, the Medicaid rates for supportive living facilities must be equal to 60% of the Medicaid rate in effect on July 1, 2017 for skilled nursing facilities. Effective immediately.
Title
DHFS-SUPPORTIVE LIVING FACILTY
Sponsors
Sen. Sara Feigenholtz [D] | Rep. Robyn Gabel [D] | Rep. Will Guzzardi [D] | Sen. Robert Martwick [D] |
Rep. Kathleen Willis [D] | Sen. Michael Halpin [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee |
2017-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2017-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2017-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-07 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
305 | 5 | 5-5.01a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2467&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB2467.htm |