IL HB2458 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Meat and Poultry Inspection Act. Provides that a processor or establishment may affix a label to meat or a meat food product or poultry or a poultry food product that states that the meat or poultry was Illinois-raised if that meat or poultry was raised in Illinois.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ILLINOIS-ORIGIN MEAT LABELING

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-29HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney
2019-02-26HouseAssigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee
2019-02-20HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Darren Bailey
2019-02-13HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-13HouseFirst Reading
2019-02-13HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Chris Miller

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
22565013Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback