IL HB2453 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-10 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-10 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Health Care Worker Background Check Act. Provides that a health care employer or long-term care facility may hire, employ, or retain any individual in a position involving direct care for clients, patients, or residents, or access to the living quarters or the financial, medical, or personal records of residents, who has been convicted of committing or attempting to commit one or more specified offenses, either within 5, 10, or 25 years after the date of conviction, only with a waiver. Provides that the Health Care Worker Task Force shall include: 2 individuals with a criminal record who work with a community organization that works with people with criminal records; an individual from a legal services agency that represents people with criminal records; an individual from an organization that advocates for improved opportunity for people with criminal records; and a representative from a provider that helps connect people with criminal records with employment. Provides that on or before January 1, 2025, the Task Force shall issue recommendations to the Department of Public Health. Provides that beginning January 1, 2024, the Task Force shall make recommendations to the Department regarding connecting people with criminal records to employment with work in the health care industry. Provides that on or before January 1 of each year, the Department shall report to the Task Force, the Governor, and both houses of the General Assembly specified information for the previous fiscal year. Makes conforming changes to the Code of Civil Procedure.
Title
HEALTH WORK BACKGROUND CHECK
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-10 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-28 | House | Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2023-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2023-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Justin Slaughter |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 46 | 25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 46 | 65 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
735 | 5 | 8-3001 | New Code | See Bill Text |
735 | 5 | Art. VIII Pt. 30 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2453&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB2453.htm |