IL HB2452 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-11 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0058
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-11 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0058
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Community-Integrated Living Arrangements Licensure and Certification Act. Provides that the Department of Human Services shall conduct inspections of the records and premises of each community-integrated living arrangement certified under the Act at least once every 2 years. Effective immediately.
Title
COMMUNITY-INTEGRATED LIVING
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-19 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-11 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0058 |
2017-08-11 | House | Effective Date August 11, 2017 |
2017-08-11 | House | Governor Approved |
2017-06-16 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2017-05-19 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000 |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2017 |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 4, 2017 |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Do Pass Human Services; 007-000-000 |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Assigned to Human Services |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-04-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Chris Nybo |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 28, 2017 |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-03-16 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-000-000 |
2017-03-15 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-15 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-08 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 012-000-000 |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-07 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
210 | 135 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |