IL HB2449 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Title Insurance Act. Provides that the amendatory Act may be referred to as the Title Insurance Reform Act of 2023. Provides that no person, firm, partnership, association, corporation or other legal entity shall act as or hold itself out to be a title insurance agent without first procuring a certificate of authority from the Secretary of Financial and Professional Regulation (rather than unless duly registered by a title insurance company with the Secretary). Provides that a certificate of authority shall remain in effect unless revoked or suspended by the Secretary or voluntarily withdrawn by the holder, or when the holder of the certificate of authority is no longer authorized as a title insurance agent of a title insurance company. Provides that every applicant that is not duly registered as a title insurance agent on the effective date of the amendatory Act shall comply with specified requirements. Provides that the Secretary shall maintain a database of title insurance agents in good standing on a publicly accessible website that any person may use to verify the authority of a particular title insurance agent. Sets forth duties applicable to transactions involving residential real property for title insurance companies, title insurance agents, and independent escrowees. Effective immediately.
Title
TITLE INSURANCE-VARIOUS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-22 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-22 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-07 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Insurance Committee; 014-000-000 |
2023-02-23 | House | Assigned to Insurance Committee |
2023-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2023-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Ann M. Williams |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
215 | 155 | 15.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
215 | 155 | 16 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 155 | 16.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
215 | 155 | 17.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
215 | 155 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2449&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB2449.htm |