IL HB2449 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-05 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-05 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Home Birth Safety Act. Provides for the licensure of midwives by the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation and for certain limitations on the activities of licensed midwives. Creates the Illinois Midwifery Board. Sets forth provisions concerning application, qualifications, grounds for disciplinary action, and administrative procedures. Amends the Regulatory Sunset Act to set a repeal date for the new Act of January 1, 2030. Amends the Medical Practice Act of 1987, the Nurse Practice Act, and the Illinois Public Aid Code to make related changes.
Title
HOME BIRTH SAFETY ACT
Sponsors
Rep. Robyn Gabel [D] | Rep. Joyce Mason [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 60 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 65 | 5-15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 65 | 50-15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
305 | 5 | 5-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 80 | 4.40 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2449&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB2449.htm |