IL HB2442 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-30 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0157
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-30 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0157
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the contents of the introduced bill with the following changes. Provides that subsequent teaching endorsements may be granted to licensed employees for specific content areas and grade levels as part of a pilot program (instead of allowing subsequent endorsements to be granted to licensed employees through entitlement by the school district for specific content areas and grade levels); makes related changes. Requires the professional development sequences to be approved by the State Board of Education, in collaboration with the State Educator Preparation and Licensure Board (instead of approved by the State Educator Preparation and Licensure Board). Provides that the sequences shall (instead of may) include a comprehensive review. Removes the provision requiring the State Educator Preparation and Licensure Board to approve the sequences or, within 10 business days after the Board's meeting, return the sequences to the district with notes to amend the sequences. Provides that the State Board of Education shall adopt any rules necessary for implementation no later than June 30, 2024. Effective immediately.
Title
SCH CD-SUBSEQUENT ENDORSEMENT
Sponsors
Rep. Angelica Guerrero-Cuellar [D] | Rep. Jaime Andrade [D] | Sen. Celina Villanueva [D] | Sen. Laura Murphy [D] |
Sen. Ann Gillespie [D] | Sen. Steve Stadelman [D] | Sen. Suzanne Glowiak Hilton [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-11 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-30 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0157 |
2023-06-30 | House | Effective Date June 30, 2023 |
2023-06-30 | House | Governor Approved |
2023-06-09 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2023-05-11 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie |
2023-05-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** May 8, 2023 |
2023-05-05 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2023 |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 20, 2023 |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Do Pass Education; 012-000-000 |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-03-30 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 28, 2023 |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2023-03-23 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-000-000 |
2023-03-22 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-22 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted by Voice Vote |
2023-03-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools; 008-000-000 |
2023-03-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools |
2023-03-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Angelica Guerrero-Cuellar |
2023-03-10 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-08 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools; 006-003-000 |
2023-03-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2023-02-28 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools |
2023-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2023-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Angelica Guerrero-Cuellar |