IL HB2432 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Provides that a taxpayer shall be allowed an income tax credit equal to 50% of the taxpayer's qualified investments in a qualified business during the taxable year. Defines "qualified investments" and "qualified business". Provides that any credit not usable for the taxable year may be carried over for the next 15 succeeding taxable years. Provides that the amount of tax credit available for a calendar year shall be $5,000,000. Effective immediately.
Title
INC TX-CAPITAL GAINS CREDIT
Sponsors
Rep. Dwight Kay [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2015-03-06 | House | To Income Tax Subcommittee |
2015-03-02 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2015-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-17 | House | First Reading |
2015-02-11 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Dwight Kay |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2432&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HB/09900HB2432.htm |