IL HB2430 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals the Rent Control Preemption Act.
Title
RENT CONTROL PREEMPTION ACT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris |
2018-04-13 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2018-04-13 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2018-03-29 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2017-08-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2017-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2017-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2017-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo |
2017-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2017-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2017-02-24 | House | To Real & Personal Property Law Subcommittee |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-06 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Will Guzzardi |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
50 | 825 | Act | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2430&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB2430.htm |