IL HB2425 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 22-4)
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-12 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-12 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Endangered Species Protection Act. Provides that a permit for incidental taking under the Act shall not be required: (1) on land that is subject to and for activities that are implemented in compliance with a federal Candidate Conservation Agreement or Candidate Conservation Agreement with Assurances approved by the United States Fish and Wildlife Service under the federal Endangered Species Act of 1973; or (2) for covered conservation practices conducted in this State within a federal program authorized under a Conference Report under the federal Endangered Species Act of 1973 on land subject to that program. Provides that upon an automatic listing of a federally-listed species, the Endangered Species Protection Board shall immediately publish a notice for a public hearing and conduct a hearing within 14 days of the automatic listing. Provides that the listing, delisting, or change of listing status for any non-federally listed species shall be made only after a public hearing. Effective immediately.
Title
WILDLIFE-ENDANGERED SPECIES
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-11 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 60 N: 47 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-12 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2019-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2019-04-12 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2019-04-11 | House | Motion Filed to Reconsider Vote Rep. Fred Crespo |
2019-04-11 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 060-047-003 |
2019-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2019-04-10 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2019-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste |
2019-04-10 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2019-04-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2019-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick |
2019-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2019-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 010-002-000 |
2019-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Agriculture & Conservation Committee |
2019-04-08 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-08 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Andrew S. Chesney |
2019-03-21 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-19 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 013-000-000 |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2019-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2019-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2019-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Murphy |
2019-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer |
2019-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst |
2019-02-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo |
2019-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese |
2019-02-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee |
2019-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer |
2019-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael T. Marron |
2019-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2019-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2019-02-20 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Charles Meier |
2019-02-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier |
2019-02-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Blaine Wilhour |
2019-02-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller |
2019-02-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Darren Bailey |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Andrew S. Chesney |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
520 | 10 | 5.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
520 | 10 | 5.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
520 | 10 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
520 | 10 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |