IL HB2402 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-30 - Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that no person shall drive or operate a motorcycle with a noise level intensity at a distance of 50 feet from the centerline of the lane of travel that exceeds: (1) 80 decibels on a highway with a speed limit of 35 miles per hour or less; (2) 82 decibels when driving or operating a motorcycle on a grade exceeding 3% on a highway with a speed limit of 35 miles per hour or less; or (3) 86 decibels on a highway with a speed limit of more than 35 miles per hour. Establishes penalties. Reinforces that the audible signal intensity of a siren on an ambulance or a rescue vehicle shall not exceed 100 decibels at a distance of 50 feet from the siren. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

VEH CD-NOISE LEVEL-MOTORCYCLE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-30HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-30HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 005-004-000
2017-03-29HouseRemains in Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
2017-03-29HouseMotion Do Pass as Amended - Lost Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 004-004-000
2017-03-29HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; by Voice Vote
2017-03-27HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
2017-03-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Christian L. Mitchell
2017-02-14HouseAssigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
2017-02-06HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-06HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-03HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Christian L. Mitchell

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
625511-1421Amended CodeCitation Text
625512-602Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback