IL HB2397 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 3 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Property Tax Extension Limitation Law in the Property Tax Code. Provides that, if, at the end of any levy year, a taxing district has reserves of 50% or more of its operating budget for that levy year, then, for the next levy year, "extension limitation" means 0% or the rate of increase approved by the voters. Preempts the power of home rule units to tax. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PTELL-RESERVES

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-26HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017
2017-05-18HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 26, 2017
2017-05-18HouseTo Property Tax Subcommittee
2017-05-18HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-02-24HouseTo Property Tax Subcommittee
2017-02-21HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2017-02-14HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2017-02-06HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-06HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-03HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Fred Crespo

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
308058.41New CodeSee Bill Text
3520018-185Amended CodeCitation Text
3520018-205Amended CodeCitation Text
3520018-242New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback