IL HB2390 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 41-3)
Status: Passed on August 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0260
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 41-3)
Status: Passed on August 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0260
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Removes cap on restitution. Removes intent requirement for hate crime committed in or causing damage to a place of worship. Provides that as a condition of probation or conditional discharge for hate crime, the court shall require the offender to perform public or community service of no less than 200 hours (even if that service is not established in the county where the offender was convicted of hate crime) and to enroll in an educational program discouraging hate crimes involving the protected class identified in the statute that gave rise to the offense committed. The educational program must be attended in-person. Expands organization that can provide the educational program. Clarifies that any hate crime victim who files a civil action shall be entitled to recover attorney's fees and costs. Provides that the parents or legal guardians, other than guardians appointed under the Juvenile Court Act, of an unemancipated minor shall be liable for the amount of any judgment for a hate crime for all (rather than actual) damages rendered against the minor in any amount not exceeding the amount provided under the Parental Responsibility Law. Requires if a person is convicted of hate crime in addition to one or more other convictions, that if imprisonment is to be imposed on the convictions the sentences must be served consecutively.
Title
CRIM CD&CD CORR-HATE CRIME
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-22 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0260 |
2017-08-22 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2018 |
2017-08-22 | House | Governor Approved |
2017-06-28 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2017-05-30 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000 |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 24, 2017 |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 15, 2017 |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Do Pass Criminal Law; 008-000-000 |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-02 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-04-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2017-04-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo |
2017-04-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton |
2017-04-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2017-04-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2017-04-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2017-04-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elaine Nekritz |
2017-04-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2017-04-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2017-04-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2017-04-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2017-04-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2017-04-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2017-04-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2017-04-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2017-04-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2017-04-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2017-04-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2017-04-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2017-04-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell |
2017-04-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2017-04-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2017-04-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2017-04-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2017-04-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2017-04-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2017-04-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2017-04-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2017-04-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2017-04-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang |
2017-04-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2017-04-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2017-04-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2017-04-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2017-04-28 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-000-000 |
2017-04-26 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted |
2017-04-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer |
2017-04-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen |
2017-04-05 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 012-000-000 |
2017-03-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2017-03-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2017-03-22 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2017-03-21 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 008-005-000 |
2017-03-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary - Criminal Committee; by Voice Vote |
2017-03-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2017-03-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2017-03-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2017-03-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2017-02-14 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2017-02-06 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-06 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-03 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2017-02-03 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 5 | 12-7.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 5 | 3-3-7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 5 | 5-6-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 5 | 5-8-4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |