IL HB2389 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0032
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0032
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that no motor vehicle, or driver or passenger of a motor vehicle, shall be stopped or searched by any law enforcement officer solely on the basis of a violation or suspected violation of driving a motor vehicle with any objects placed or suspended between the driver and the front windshield, rear windshield, side wings, or side windows immediately adjacent to each side of the driver which materially obstructs the driver's view.
Title
VEH CD-WINDSHIELD DRIVERS VIEW
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-04 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 41 N: 11 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 70 N: 37 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 70 N: 37 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-09 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0032 |
2023-06-09 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2024 |
2023-06-09 | House | Governor Approved |
2023-06-02 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2023-05-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2023-05-08 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura |
2023-05-04 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 041-011-000 |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Willie Preston |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2023 |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 20, 2023 |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Do Pass Transportation; 017-001-000 |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert F. Martwick |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-03-27 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2023-03-24 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 070-037-000 |
2023-03-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-24 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2023-03-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2023-03-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Angelica Guerrero-Cuellar |
2023-03-23 | House | State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested - Withdrawn by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2023-03-23 | House | State Debt Impact Note Requested - Withdrawn by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2023-03-23 | House | Pension Note Requested - Withdrawn by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2023-03-23 | House | Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Requested - Withdrawn by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2023-03-23 | House | Judicial Note Requested - Withdrawn by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2023-03-23 | House | Housing Affordability Impact Note Requested - Withdrawn by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2023-03-23 | House | Home Rule Note Requested - Withdrawn by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2023-03-23 | House | Fiscal Note Requested - Withdrawn by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2023-03-23 | House | Correctional Note Requested - Withdrawn by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2023-03-23 | House | Balanced Budget Note Requested - Withdrawn by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2023-03-22 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-22 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-22 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety; 007-000-000 |
2023-03-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Transportation: Vehicles & Safety; 007-000-000 |
2023-03-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety |
2023-03-14 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-14 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2023-03-14 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety |
2023-03-13 | House | Fiscal Note Filed |
2023-03-13 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) April 28, 2023 |
2023-02-21 | House | State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2023-02-21 | House | State Debt Impact Note Requested by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2023-02-21 | House | Pension Note Requested by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2023-02-21 | House | Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Requested by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2023-02-21 | House | Judicial Note Requested by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2023-02-21 | House | Housing Affordability Impact Note Requested by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2023-02-21 | House | Home Rule Note Requested by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2023-02-21 | House | Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2023-02-21 | House | Balanced Budget Note Requested by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2023-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2023-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 12-503 | Amended Code | Citation Text |