IL HB2386 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Environmental Protection Act. Provides that a person may sell or offer for sale at retail in the State any metal beverage container designed and constructed in such a manner that a part of the container is detachable in opening the container without the aid of a can opener if the part comprises substantially all of one of the ends of the metal beverage container.
Title
EPA-METAL BEVERAGE CONTAINERS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-19 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn |
2017-08-11 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0051 |
2017-08-11 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2018 |
2017-08-11 | House | Governor Approved |
2017-06-16 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2017-05-19 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2017 |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 5, 2017 |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Do Pass Environment and Conservation; 005-000-000 |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Assigned to Environment and Conservation |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-03-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Chris Nybo |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-03-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2017-03-15 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000 |
2017-03-09 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-09 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-07 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Tourism, Hospitality & Craft Industries Committee; 010-000-000 |
2017-02-14 | House | Assigned to Tourism, Hospitality & Craft Industries Committee |
2017-02-03 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-03 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-03 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Peter Breen |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
415 | 5 | 21.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |