IL HB2385 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 34-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the provisions of the introduced bill with the following changes. Provides that a group or individual policy of accident and health insurance or managed care plan amended, delivered, issued, or renewed on or after January 1, 2025 (rather than January 1, 2024) shall provide coverage for a colonoscopy determined to be medically necessary (rather than medically necessary for persons aged 39 years old to 75 years old).
Title
INS-COLONOSCOPY COVERAGE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-19 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-04-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Willie Preston |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2024-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Matt Hanson |
2024-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2024-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2024-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2024-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2024-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sharon Chung |
2024-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2024-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Yolonda Morris |
2024-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar |
2024-04-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled |
2024-04-19 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 095-000-001 |
2024-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock |
2024-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2024-04-19 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2024-04-19 | House | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch |
2024-04-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Insurance Committee; 015-000-000 |
2024-04-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Insurance Committee |
2024-04-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Cyril Nichols |
2024-04-15 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-15 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 005-000-000 |
2023-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2023-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2023-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr. |
2023-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nabeela Syed |
2023-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Abdelnasser Rashid |
2023-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Hoan Huynh |
2023-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Vella |
2023-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregg Johnson |
2023-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2023-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez |
2023-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith |
2023-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2023-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2023-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2023-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan |
2023-03-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lakesia Collins |
2023-03-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2023-03-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-22 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-22 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Harry Benton |
2023-03-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jenn Ladisch Douglass |
2023-03-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2023-03-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Insurance Committee |
2023-03-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Cyril Nichols |
2023-03-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-07 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Insurance Committee; 014-000-000 |
2023-02-28 | House | Assigned to Insurance Committee |
2023-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2023-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Cyril Nichols |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
215 | 5 | 356z.48 | Amended Code | Citation Text |