IL HB2378 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-08-04 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the School Code. Removes language requiring a student's transcript to show the scores attained by the student on a State assessment that includes a college and career ready determination. Requires the transcript to represent that the student has taken the State assessment, provided that the scores attained by the student shall not be placed on the transcript.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH CD-TRANSCRIPTS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-04SenatePursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2017-05-26SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-05-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2017
2017-05-12SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2017
2017-05-09SenateDo Pass Education; 010-000-000
2017-05-03SenatePostponed - Education
2017-04-25SenateAssigned to Education
2017-04-04SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-04-04SenateFirst Reading
2017-04-04SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
2017-04-04SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-04-04SenateArrive in Senate
2017-03-31HouseMotion to Reconsider Vote - Withdrawn Rep. Steven A. Andersson
2017-03-29HouseMotion Filed to Reconsider Vote Rep. Steven A. Andersson
2017-03-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2017-03-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2017-03-29HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000
2017-03-23HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted
2017-03-23HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-22HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 014-000-000
2017-03-21HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
2017-03-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
2017-03-16HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-16HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Scott Drury
2017-03-08HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
2017-03-08HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
2017-03-06HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-06HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Scott Drury
2017-03-03HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-03HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Scott Drury
2017-02-23HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-02-23HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 019-000-000
2017-02-14HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
2017-02-03HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-03HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-03HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Scott Drury

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
10552-3.64a-5Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback