IL HB2373 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that no agency of the State shall disclose the personal information of a driver with a driver's license issued by the State to another state or an interstate motor vehicle information network for the purpose of imposing or collecting a fine or penalty resulting from an alleged violation committed in another state that was captured by an automated speed enforcement system or automated traffic law enforcement system located in that state. Defines "interstate motor vehicle information network". Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

VEH CD-AUTOMATED TRAFFIC INFO

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-29HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-06HouseTo Special Issues Subcommittee (TVS)
2019-02-26HouseAssigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
2019-02-13HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-13HouseFirst Reading
2019-02-13HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Allen Skillicorn

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
625511-208.6Amended CodeCitation Text
625511-208.8Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback