IL HB2371 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on August 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-08 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0040
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on August 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-08 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0040
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Data Security on State Computers Act. Requires State employees to annually undergo training by the Department of Innovation and Technology concerning cybersecurity. Allows the Department to make the training an online course. Requires the training to include detecting phishing scams, preventing spyware infections and identity theft, and preventing and responding to data breaches. Allows the Department to adopt rules to implement the program.
Title
STATE EMPLOYEES-CYBERSECURITY
Sponsors
Rep. Emanuel Welch [D] | Sen. Elgie Sims [D] | Rep. Jaime Andrade [D] | Rep. Frances Hurley [D] |
Rep. Robert Pritchard [R] | Sen. Mattie Hunter [D] | Sen. Jacqueline Collins [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-15 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-08 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0040 |
2017-08-08 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2018 |
2017-08-08 | House | Governor Approved |
2017-06-13 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2017-05-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2017-05-15 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2017 |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 5, 2017 |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Do Pass State Government; 007-000-000 |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-03-17 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-03-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2017-03-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2017-03-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2017-03-16 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 107-000-000 |
2017-03-15 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-15 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2017-03-09 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-09 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Cybersecurity, Data Analytics, & IT Committee; 008-001-000 |
2017-03-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Cybersecurity, Data Analytics, & IT Committee; by Voice Vote |
2017-02-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Cybersecurity, Data Analytics, & IT Committee |
2017-02-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2017-02-14 | House | Assigned to Cybersecurity, Data Analytics, & IT Committee |
2017-02-03 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-03 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-03 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |