IL HB2367 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Criminal Identification Act. Provides that records of conviction for a non-violent offense or a criminal offense that did not result in bodily harm or death to another person may be sealed 10 years after the termination of the petitioner's last sentence. Provides that the new provisions apply only to a petitioner who has not had one or more criminal convictions between the conviction eligible for sealing and the filing of the petition for relief. Defines "non-violent offense".

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CRIM ID-SEALING RECORDS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-28HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-15HouseRemove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
2017-03-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler
2017-03-15HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-15HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-03-15HouseRecalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2017-03-15HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2017-03-13HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-13HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2017-03-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2017-03-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi
2017-03-09HouseRemove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2017-03-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones
2017-03-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2017-03-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi
2017-03-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
2017-03-07HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-07HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-02-24HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-02-23HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Restorative Justice Committee; 012-000-000
2017-02-14HouseAssigned to Restorative Justice Committee
2017-02-03HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-03HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-03HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2026305.2Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback