IL HB2365 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that a municipality with a population of more than 1,000,000 may not operate an automated traffic law enforcement system. Provides that the prohibition may be reconsidered through the introduction of appropriate legislation upon the submission by the municipality of a report to the General Assembly detailing procedures that the municipality will implement to address specified issues in a satisfactory manner. Makes conforming changes.
Title
VEH CD-RED LIGHT CAMERAS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-29 | House | To Red Light Camera Subcommittee |
2017-02-14 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2017-02-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn |
2017-02-03 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-03 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-03 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 11-208.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2365&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB2365.htm |