IL HB2364 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Procurement Code. Prohibits any person or business who violates the Illinois Wage Payment and Collection Act, the Minimum Wage Law, the Illinois Worker Adjustment and Retraining Notification Act, the Employee Classification Act, the Fair Labor Standards Act of 1938, or any comparable state statute or regulation of any state which governs the payment of wages to do business with the State or any State agency or enter into a subcontract that is subject to the Code for a period of 5 years. Amends the Illinois Wage Payment and Collection Act. Provides that when an employee who is scheduled to work 3 or more hours reports for duty at the time set by the employer, and that employee is not provided with the expected hours of work, the employee shall be paid for at least 4 hours on such day at no less than the employee's regular rate of compensation. Amends the Illinois Wage Payment and Collection Act. Provides that an employer that is able to pay wages and who refuses to pay is guilty of a Class 4 felony (rather than a misdemeanor). Provides that a subsequent failure to pay within 5 years (rather than 2 years) of a prior conviction is a Class 3 felony (rather than a Class 4 felony).
Title
ANTI-WAGE THEFT-STATE CONTRACT
Sponsors
Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez [D] | Rep. Silvana Tabares [D] | Rep. Luis Arroyo [D] | Rep. Linda LaVia [D] |
Rep. Daniel Burke [D] | Rep. Theresa Mah [D] | Rep. Stephanie Kifowit [D] | Rep. Camille Lilly [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-05-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2017-04-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2017-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
2017-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2017-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo |
2017-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2017-02-14 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2017-02-03 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-03 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-03 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 500 | 50-14.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 500 | 50-60 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
820 | 115 | 14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
820 | 115 | 4.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2364&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB2364.htm |