IL HB2354 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Veterinary Medical Practice Ownership Act. Provides that one or more persons licensed under the Veterinary Medicine and Surgery Practice Act of 2004, or one or more persons or entities not licensed under the Veterinary Medicine and Surgery Practice Act of 2004, may form a veterinary practice in any legal form under applicable laws to own, operate, and maintain an establishment for specified purposes related to animal ailments and injuries, subject to specified restrictions. Contains provisions regarding the death of an owner, actions based on violations, relationships with clients, discipline, severability, and other matters.
Title
VETERINARY PRACTICE OWNERSHIP
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-03 | House | Session Sine Die |
2013-03-22 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2013-03-14 | House | To Business Licenses Subcommittee |
2013-02-25 | House | Assigned to Business & Occupational Licenses Committee |
2013-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-02-19 | House | First Reading |
2013-02-19 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Frank J. Mautino |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2354&GAID=12&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/HB/09800HB2354.htm |