IL HB2351 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that any tow initiated by a law enforcement agency or officer shall be communicated by the law enforcement agency directly to the tow company by phone or computer. Effective immediately.
Title
VEH CD-POLICE-INITIATED TOWING
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-03 | House | Session Sine Die |
2013-04-19 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2013-04-18 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-04-18 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-13 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-03-13 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. John D'Amico |
2013-03-13 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-13 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2013-03-13 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 008-000-000 |
2013-03-13 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; by Voice Vote |
2013-03-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-03-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. John D'Amico |
2013-03-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2013-03-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-03-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. John D'Amico |
2013-02-25 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2013-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-02-19 | House | First Reading |
2013-02-19 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. John D'Amico |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 11-1431 | Amended Code | Citation Text |