IL HB2349 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-31 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Public Duty Rule Codification Act. Contains legislative findings and a statement of legislative purpose. Provides that a local governmental entity and its employees owe no duty of care to individual members of the general public to provide governmental services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PUBLIC DUTY RULE CODIFICATION

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-29HouseRemains in Judiciary - Civil Committee
2017-03-29HouseMotion Do Pass - Lost Judiciary - Civil Committee; 002-002-001; - Subcommittee
2017-03-24HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner
2017-03-24HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2017-03-24HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2017-02-24HouseTo Tort Liability Law Subcommittee
2017-02-14HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2017-02-03HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-03HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-02HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Keith R. Wheeler

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback