IL HB2340 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-10 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-10 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Property Tax Code. Provides that no county employee or county official shall publicly disclose on an Internet website information concerning whether particular property has been granted a homestead exemption based on an individual's status as a person with a disability if the county receives a written request from the person with a disability or from that person's authorized agent or representative to refrain from disclosing that information. Provides that the information shall be removed from the Internet website within 5 business days after the request. Provides for an action in the circuit court seeking injunctive or declaratory relief to enforce the provisions of the amendatory Act.
Title
PROP TX-DISABILITY INFO
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-10 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-09 | House | To Revenue - Property Tax Subcommittee |
2023-02-28 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2023-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2023-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. David Friess |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2340&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB2340.htm |