IL HB2339 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title of the Code.
Title
STATE GOVERNMENT-TECH
Sponsors
Rep. James Durkin [R] | Rep. Bill Mitchell [R] | Rep. Patricia Bellock [R] | Rep. Tony McCombie [R] |
Rep. Carol Sente [D] | Rep. Dan Brady [R] | Rep. Norine Hammond [R] | Rep. Peter Breen [R] |
Rep. Michael Unes [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-05-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael D. Unes |
2018-05-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Peter Breen |
2018-05-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2018-05-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady |
2018-05-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente |
2018-05-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2018-05-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2018-05-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bill Mitchell |
2017-04-28 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-27 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate *** |
2017-04-27 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate *** |
2017-03-29 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2017-03-22 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2017-02-03 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-03 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-02 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jim Durkin |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 5 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 5 | 1-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2339&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB2339.htm |