IL HB2337 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 14 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-14 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0459
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 14 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-14 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0459
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends The Department of Professional Regulation Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Provides that, with certain exceptions, no person or entity whose license, certificate, or authority has been revoked by the Department may apply for a restoration of the license, certificate, or authority for a 3-year period. Effective immediately.
Title
DFPR-LICENSE REVOCATIONS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-05-19 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-14 | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0459 | |
2009-08-14 | Effective Date August 14, 2009 | |
2009-08-14 | Governor Approved | |
2009-06-17 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-19 | Passed Both Houses | |
2009-05-19 | Third Reading - Passed; 058-001-000 | |
2009-05-12 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** May 18, 2009 | |
2009-05-12 | Second Reading | |
2009-04-23 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 28, 2009 | |
2009-04-23 | Do Pass Licensed Activities; 008-000-000 | |
2009-04-15 | Assigned to Licensed Activities | |
2009-03-26 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-03-26 | First Reading | |
2009-03-25 | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. William R. Haine | |
2009-03-25 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 26, 2009 | |
2009-03-25 | Arrive in Senate | |
2009-03-24 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-001-000 | |
2009-03-24 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-23 | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-23 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-12 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-11 | Do Pass / Short Debate Business & Occupational Licenses Committee; 013-000-000 | |
2009-02-23 | Assigned to Business & Occupational Licenses Committee | |
2009-02-19 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-19 | First Reading | |
2009-02-18 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Angelo Saviano |