IL HB2327 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-13 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-13 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that on and after January 1, 2010, in order to use a "LINK" electronic benefits transfer card to obtain food stamp benefits or cash, the user must show a current and valid photo identification. Prohibits such use of a LINK card if the name on the photo identification does not match the name on the LINK card or if the photo does not match the user of the card. Provides that every LINK card issued on or after the effective date of the amendatory Act must include on its face the name of every household member entitled to use the card. Effective January 1, 2010.
Title
DHS-FOOD STAMP CARD-PHOTO ID
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-13 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-03-11 | Remains in Human Services Committee | |
2009-03-11 | Motion Do Pass - Lost Human Services Committee; 003-004-000 | |
2009-02-23 | Assigned to Human Services Committee | |
2009-02-18 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-18 | First Reading | |
2009-02-18 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Dave Winters |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2327&GAID=10&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/HB/09600HB2327.htm |