IL HB2292 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Failed on January 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-01-11 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Failed on January 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-01-11 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates $300,000 from the General Revenue Fund to the State Board of Education for the assessment of physical fitness levels of students. Effective July 1, 2009.
Title
$ISBE-ASSESS PHYSICAL FITNESS
Sponsors
Rep. Elizabeth Coulson [R] | Rep. William Davis [D] | Rep. Kevin Joyce [D] | Rep. Louis Lang [D] |
Rep. David Miller [D] | Rep. Jerry Mitchell [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-01-11 | Session Sine Die | |
2009-12-01 | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-03-10 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis | |
2009-02-24 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang | |
2009-02-23 | Assigned to Appropriations-Elementary & Secondary Education Committee | |
2009-02-18 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-18 | First Reading | |
2009-02-18 | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin Joyce | |
2009-02-18 | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Coulson | |
2009-02-18 | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry L. Mitchell | |
2009-02-18 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. David E. Miller |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2292&GAID=10&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/HB/PDF/09600HB2292.pdf |