IL HB2264 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-4)
Status: Passed on August 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0383
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-4)
Status: Passed on August 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0383
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the County Cooperative Extension Law. In order to provide matching funds, which shall not exceed an amount equal to 50% of the funds needed as provided herein, and funds for the purpose of general support to counties for Cooperative Extension programs the State will recognize those needs and shall (rather than may) make an annual appropriation from the Agricultural Premium Fund or any other source of funding available. Effective immediately.
Title
AGR-COOPERATIVE TRUST FUND
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-16 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0383 |
2019-08-16 | House | Effective Date August 16, 2019 |
2019-08-16 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-06-19 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-21 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2019 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve McClure |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2019 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Do Pass Agriculture; 007-000-000 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Agriculture |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Chuck Weaver |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 4, 2019 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-04-03 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000 |
2019-04-02 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-02 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-27 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Appropriations-General Services Committee; 011-000-000 |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese |
2019-03-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Darren Bailey |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins |
2019-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael T. Marron |
2019-02-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2019-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2019-02-27 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2019-02-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2019-02-26 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2019-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2019-02-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2019-02-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Weber |
2019-02-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2019-02-19 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-General Services Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Charles Meier |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
505 | 45 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |