IL HB2252 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0253
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0253
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Clerk Division of the Counties Code. Makes all provisions of the Division gender neutral. Makes some technical and grammatical changes. Effective immediately.
Title
CLERKS-GENDER-NEUTRAL LANGUAGE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-09 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0253 |
2019-08-09 | House | Effective Date August 9, 2019 |
2019-08-09 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-06-19 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-21 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2019 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2019 |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Do Pass Local Government; 007-000-000 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Local Government |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-27 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-03-27 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-003-000 |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2019-03-06 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-06 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-02-28 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-02-27 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 011-000-000 |
2019-02-19 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2019-02-07 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-07 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-07 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Carol Ammons |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
55 | 5 | 3-2001 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
55 | 5 | 3-2002 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
55 | 5 | 3-2003.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
55 | 5 | 3-2003.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
55 | 5 | 3-2003.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
55 | 5 | 3-2003.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
55 | 5 | 3-2005 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
55 | 5 | 3-2007 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
55 | 5 | 3-2008 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
55 | 5 | 3-2009 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
55 | 5 | 3-2010 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
55 | 5 | 3-2012 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
55 | 5 | 3-2013 | Amended Code | Citation Text |