IL HB2250 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Provides that the Department of Corrections shall make information about the availability of referral services to any other State or local agencies known to a parolee or releasee prior to his or her release from the correctional facility where the parolee or releasee has been residing. Effective immediately.
Title
CD CORR-REFERRAL SERVICES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-05-19 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2020-03-12 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-000-000 |
2019-04-12 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-10 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-10 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2019-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2019-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2019-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi |
2019-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2019-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2019-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II |
2019-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner |
2019-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2019-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2019-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith |
2019-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr. |
2019-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2019-04-02 | House | Fiscal Note Filed |
2019-04-01 | House | Correctional Note Filed |
2019-04-01 | House | Correctional Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2019-04-01 | House | Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2019-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-26 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 015-003-000 |
2019-02-19 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2019-02-07 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-07 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-07 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
730 | 5 | 3-14-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2250&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB2250.htm |