IL HB2237 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Insurance Code. In the provision concerning firemen's continuance privilege, changes the definition of "retirement or disability period" to include the period when the disabled or retired fireman, if not enrolled in the municipal group insurance plan at the time of disability or retirement, may elect to enroll in the municipal group insurance plan during open enrollment. Provides that the disabled or retired fireman, if not enrolled in the municipal group insurance plan at the time of disability or retirement, may elect to enroll during open enrollment but not after the fireman becomes eligible for federal Medicare coverage and not more than once. Provides that the fireman must be insurable and must pay the cost of the insurance premium in order to reenter the insurance plan. Effective immediately.
Title
INS CD-FIREMEN CONTINUANCE
Sponsors
Rep. Louis Lang [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-03 | House | Session Sine Die |
2013-03-22 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2013-03-08 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2013-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2013-02-25 | House | Assigned to Cities & Villages Committee |
2013-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2013-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lou Lang |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
215 | 5 | 367f | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2237&GAID=12&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/HB/09800HB2237.htm |