IL HB2235 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-04 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0430
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-04 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0430
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Transportation Article of the School Code. Provides that school boards may enter into contracts for any period of time deemed appropriate by those school boards (rather than for up to 3 years) for transportation of pupils to and from school, except that no contract, inclusive of any proposed renewals, may exceed 10 years (rather than allowing such contracts to be extended for up to 2 additional years by mutual agreement of the parties and thereafter extended on a year-to-year basis by mutual agreement of the parties, unless a school board receives a timely request from another interested contractor that a contract be let by bid). Requires all contracts for a period of time greater than 5 years that do not include the use of electric vehicles for pupil transportation to include a termination option after 5 years. Allows contract opener clauses for any purpose to be included in the contract. Provides that a contract for pupil transportation that utilizes a significant percentage of electric vehicles may be entered into by a school board for up to 15 years if the contract relies on capital or infrastructure purchases or improvements that cannot reasonably be justified in a shorter-term contract.
Title
SCH CD-TRANSPORTATION CONTRACT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-08-04 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0430 |
2023-08-04 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2024 |
2023-08-04 | House | Governor Approved |
2023-06-08 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2023-05-10 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 4, 2023 |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Second Reading |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 27, 2023 |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Do Pass Education; 012-000-000 |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Postponed - Education |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-03-22 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2023-03-21 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-001-000 |
2023-03-16 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-10 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-08 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools; 009-000-000 |
2023-02-28 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools |
2023-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-08 | House | First Reading |
2023-02-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 29-6.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |