IL HB2215 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-1)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0252
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Fire Protection Training Act. Provides that training requirements for permanent employment as a fire fighter shall include training in the history of the fire service labor movement using curriculum and instructors provided by a statewide organization representing professional union firefighter in the State. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

FIRE FIGHTER TRAINING

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-29 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 108 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 108 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 46 N: 6 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 91 N: 11 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-09HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0252
2019-08-09HouseEffective Date August 9, 2019
2019-08-09HouseGovernor Approved
2019-06-27HouseSent to the Governor
2019-05-29HousePassed Both Houses
2019-05-29HouseHouse Concurs
2019-05-29HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 108-006-000
2019-05-29HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 108-006-000
2019-05-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2019-05-24HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2019-05-24HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2019-05-24HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-24HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-24HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Lance Yednock
2019-05-24HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Lance Yednock
2019-05-23HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1, 2
2019-05-23HouseArrived in House
2019-05-23SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2019-05-23SenateThird Reading - Passed; 046-006-000
2019-05-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2019-05-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; T. Cullerton
2019-05-23SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2019-05-22SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Local Government; 006-001-000
2019-05-21SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Local Government
2019-05-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2019-05-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2019-05-14SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2019
2019-05-14SenateSecond Reading
2019-05-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2019
2019-05-01SenateDo Pass as Amended Local Government; 007-000-000
2019-05-01SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2019-04-30SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Local Government
2019-04-29SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-04-29SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2019-04-24SenateAssigned to Local Government
2019-04-03SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-04-03SenateFirst Reading
2019-04-03SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2019-04-03SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2019-04-03SenateArrive in Senate
2019-03-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2019-03-28HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 091-011-001
2019-03-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Pappas
2019-03-26HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2019-03-21HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed as Amended
2019-03-21HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-21HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-19HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended
2019-03-19HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-19HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-18HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Tom Demmer
2019-03-18HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Tom Demmer
2019-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2019-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2019-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Celina Villanueva
2019-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2019-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2019-03-14HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor
2019-03-14HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor
2019-03-14HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-13HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 018-007-000
2019-03-13HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Labor & Commerce Committee; by Voice Vote
2019-03-13HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico
2019-03-13HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2019-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2019-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2019-03-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick
2019-03-12HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee
2019-03-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
2019-03-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor
2019-03-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
2019-03-06HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2019-03-05HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-05HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lance Yednock
2019-02-19HouseAssigned to Labor & Commerce Committee
2019-02-07HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-07HouseFirst Reading
2019-02-07HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Lance Yednock

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
507408Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2215&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB2215.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB2215eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB2215enr.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/publicacts/101/101-0252.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB2215ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB2215sam001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB2215sam002.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/house/10100HB2215_03282019_037000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/senate/10100HB2215_05232019_009000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/house/10100HB2215sam002_05292019_035001C.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/house/10100HB2215sam001_05292019_035000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback